SB0174 (CH0328)

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Behavioral Health Administration - Behavioral Health Advisory Council

Sponsored by:

Senator Eckardt

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 328


Synopsis:Establishing the Behavioral Health Advisory Council in the Office of the Governor; providing the purpose of the Council is to promote a quality system of care that integrates specified practices and strategies to enhance behavioral health services across the State and to advocate for specified services that promote wellness and recovery for individuals with behavioral health disorders; requiring the submission of an annual report to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 31 of each year; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senator Eckardt
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1262
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Committee(s):
Finance  View Committee HearingHealth and Government Operations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Community Facilities and Services
Mental Health
Reports
Substance Abuse
Statutes:Article - Health - General
(10-101, 10-1203, 10-301 through 10-305, 10-312, 7.5-301 through 7.5-305)
Article - State Government
(9-2801 through 9-2806)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:47 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/30/20151/30/2015First Reading Finance
2/3/20152/3/2015Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2/20/20152/20/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2/23/20152/23/2015Favorable with Amendments {457275/1 Report Adopted28
Second Reading Passed with Amendments28
2/25/20152/25/2015Third Reading Passed (47-0)30
House2/26/20152/26/2015First Reading Health and Government Operations32
3/18/20153/18/2015Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20154/6/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
4/7/20154/1/2015Favorable with Amendments {836280/1 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
4/9/20154/3/2015Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)64
Senate4/10/20154/3/2015Senate Concur - House Amendment61
Third Reading Passed (47-0)61
Passed Enrolled61
Post Passage5/12/20155/12/2015Approved by the Governor - Chapter 328

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:47 P.M.