SB0179

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Property Tax Credits - Real Property Used for Robotics Programs

Sponsored by:

Senator Guzzone

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to grant, by law, a certain property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on real property used for the purposes of a public school robotics program or nonprofit robotics program in the State; authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to provide, by law, for certain matters relating to the tax credit; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2018.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senator Guzzone
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Property - Local
Narrow Subject(s):Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
Nonprofit Organizations
Property Tax
Public Schools
Real Property
Tax Credits
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Youth -see also- Minors
Statutes:Article - Tax - Property
(9-261)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 20, 2018 4:25 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/17/20181/17/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation
Hearing 1/30 at 1:30 p.m.
1/31/20181/31/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2/1/20182/1/2018Favorable with Amendments {869635/1 Report Adopted17
Second Reading Passed with Amendments17
2/5/20182/5/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)19
House2/6/20182/6/2018First Reading Ways and Means20
3/5/20183/5/2018Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 5, 2018 3:26 P.M.