SB0184 (CH0014)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Energy Efficiency Programs - Calculation of Program Savings and Consideration of Cost-Effectiveness

Sponsored by:

Senator Middleton

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 14


Synopsis:Requiring the Public Service Commission to require each electric company to procure or provide specified energy efficiency and conservation programs and services to its electricity customers on a specified savings trajectory for the duration of the 2018-2020 and 2021-2023 program cycles; establishing a baseline for the savings trajectory; requiring that specified nonenergy benefits be quantifiable and directly related to a specified program or service; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Middleton, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Klausmeier, Mathias, Oaks, and Rosapepe
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0514
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Finance  View Committee HearingEconomic Matters
Broad Subject(s):Utility Regulation
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Conservation -see also- Soil Conservation
Energy Matters -see also- Alt Energy Sou; Fuel; Power Plants
Procurement
Public Service Commission
Retail Sales
Statutes:Article - Public Utilities
(7-211)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:09 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/18/20171/18/2017First Reading Finance
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
2/27/20172/27/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2/28/20172/28/2017Favorable with Amendments {377075/133
Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted33
3/1/20173/1/2017Favorable with Amendments {377075/1 Report Adopted34
Floor Amendment {873626/1 (Senator Hershey)34
Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Benson) Withdrawn34
Floor Amendment {873626/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (14-33)34
Second Reading Passed with Amendments34
3/3/20173/3/2017Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 36
3/7/20173/7/2017Third Reading Passed (32-14)38
House3/8/20173/8/2017First Reading Economic Matters41
3/24/20173/24/2017Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/24/20173/21/2017Favorable Report Adopted55
Second Reading Passed55
3/27/20173/22/2017Third Reading Passed (93-44)56
Senate3/28/20173/24/2017Returned Passed53
Post Passage4/6/20174/6/2017Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 14

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:09 P.M.