SB0186 (CH0009)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2018, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, and 2017

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9


Synopsis:Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of One Billion, Ninety-One Million, One Hundred and Seventy-Nine Thousand Dollars ($1,091,179,000), the proceeds to be used for certain necessary building, construction, demolition, planning, renovation, conversion, replacement, and capital equipment purchases of the State, for acquiring certain real estate in connection therewith, and for grants to certain subdivisions and other organizations for certain development and improvement purposes; etc.
Analysis:Not available at this time
All Sponsors:The President (By Request - Administration)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0162
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018, June 1, 2019, June 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Budget and TaxationAppropriations
Broad Subject(s):Capital Budget
Narrow Subject(s):Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Capital Budgets
State Bonds
Statutes:Article - Chapter of the Acts
(2007, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


June 1, 2018 3:31 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/17/20181/17/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation
3/19/20183/19/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/19/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments48B
Special Order until 3/20 (Senator DeGrange) Adopted 48B
3/20/20183/18/2018Favorable with Amendments49
Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#2-10) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#11-16) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#17-44) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#45) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#46-85) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#86-94) Adopted49
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/21/20183/19/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)50
House3/21/20183/17/2018First Reading Appropriations51
3/23/20183/23/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/23/20183/18/2018Favorable with Amendments52A
Special Order until 3/26 (Delegate Jones) Adopted 52A
3/26/20183/19/2018Favorable with Amendments53
Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted53
Committee Amendment (#2-4) Adopted53
Committee Amendment (#5-9) Adopted53
Committee Amendment (#10-43) Adopted53
Committee Amendment (#44-50) Adopted53
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted53
Second Reading Passed with Amendments53
Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Jones) Adopted (127-3)53
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (126-4)53
Senate3/26/20183/22/2018Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments53
Senate Requests House Recede53
Conference Committee Appointed53
Senators DeGrange, Kasemeyer, Peters, McFadden, and Edwards53
Senate advisors:53
(Senators Madaleno, Eckardt and King)53
House3/26/20183/19/2018House Refuses to Recede53
Conference Committee Appointed53
Delegates Jones, McIntosh, Gaines, A. Miller, and Ghrist53
House advisors:53
(Delegates Haynes, McKay and Reznik)53
Senate3/28/20183/24/2018Conference Committee Report Adopted55
Third Reading Passed (45-1)55
House3/28/20183/21/2018Conference Committee Report Adopted55
Third Reading Passed (130-8)55
Senate3/28/20183/24/2018Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/5/20184/5/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 5, 2018 10:56 A.M.