SB0201 (CH0175)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Fire Drill Requirements - State Fire Prevention Code

Sponsored by:

Senator King

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175


Synopsis:Requiring the State Superintendent of Schools to require each county superintendent of schools to hold fire drills in each public school in accordance with the State Fire Prevention Code.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators King, Benson, Currie, Feldman, Kagan, Manno, Peters, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1066
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Public Safety
Narrow Subject(s):Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Education, State Department of
Fire Protection
Public Schools
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-408)
Article - Public Safety
(6-206)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:09 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/19/20171/19/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/20171/20/2017Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
2/6/20172/6/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/20172/7/2017Favorable Report Adopted18
Second Reading Passed18
2/9/20172/9/2017Third Reading Passed (45-0)20
House2/10/20172/10/2017First Reading Ways and Means23
3/1/20173/1/2017Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/30/20173/30/2017Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/30/20173/26/2017Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
3/31/20173/27/2017Third Reading Passed (137-0)61
Senate4/3/20173/28/2017Returned Passed57
Post Passage4/18/20174/18/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:09 P.M.