SB0278

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Schools - Health and Safety - Food Transparency

Sponsored by:

Senator Nathan-Pulliam

Status:

In the Senate - Second Reading Failed


Synopsis:Requiring specified local school systems to create specified dining menus; requiring a specified dining menu to include specified information under specified circumstances; requiring specified local school systems to post specified information on the local school system's Web site; requiring specified public schools to provide a specified link on the public school's Web site under specified circumstances; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Nathan-Pulliam
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1208
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Education, Boards of
Electronic Government
Food -see also- Kosher; Meat, Poultry, Seafood; Milk
Health -see also- Mental Health
Labeling
Local Government Mandates
Postal Service
Public Schools
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-437)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:47 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/4/20152/4/2015First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20153/16/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/20153/17/2015Favorable with Amendments {204136/144
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted44
3/19/20153/19/2015Favorable with Amendments {204136/146
Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 46
3/20/20153/20/2015Favorable with Amendments {204136/147
Committee Amendment Adopted47
Favorable with Amendments Report Rejected (21-24)47
Second Reading Failed47

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:47 P.M.