SB0279 (CH0157)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Election Law - Improving Access to Voting

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157


Synopsis:Requiring an individual who applies to register to vote or update an existing voter registration online to provide specified information; providing an exception to the voter registration deadline to allow an individual to register to vote or update an existing voter registration address and vote during early voting; requiring proof of residency to register or update an existing voter registration address during early voting; specifying methods of requesting an absentee ballot, including through an accessible online application; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Raskin, Benson, Conway, Ferguson, Forehand, Frosh, Garagiola, King, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Pinsky, Pugh, Rosapepe, Young, Zirkin, Montgomery, Gladden, Kasemeyer, Jones-Rodwell, Manno, McFadden, Muse, and Peters
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0224
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013, January 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  Listen to Committee HearingWays and Means
Broad Subject(s):Elections
Narrow Subject(s):Ballots
Contractors -see also- Heating & Cooling; Home Improvement
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Drivers' Licenses
Elections -see also- Ballots; Camp Financ; Pol Cands; Voting
Elections Supervisors
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Government
Facsimile Transmission
Identification
Judges
Local Government Mandates
Postal Service
Registration -see also- Motor Vehicle Registration
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Social Security
Voting -see also- Ballots; Elections
Statutes:Article - Election Law
(10-301.1, 16-201, 3-204.1, 3-302, 3-305, 9-305, 9-306, 9-308.1, 9-310)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/18/20131/18/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/4/20133/4/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable with Amendments {184239/138
Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Dyson) Adopted 38
3/7/20133/7/2013Favorable with Amendments {184239/140
Committee Amendment Adopted40
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (38-7)40
Floor Committee Amendment (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) {664735/1 Adopted40
Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {653921/2 Rejected (18-29)40
Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {743926/1 Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/11/20133/11/2013Third Reading Passed (35-12)42
House3/12/20133/12/2013First Reading Ways and Means45
3/20/20133/20/2013Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/3/20133/28/2013Favorable with Amendments {965060/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/4/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (101-37)62
Senate4/5/20134/1/2013Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted 63
4/8/20134/2/2013Senate Concur - House Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (38-9)64
Passed Enrolled64
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.