SB0304

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Healthy Working Families Act – Delay of Effective Date

Sponsored by:

Senator Middleton

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters


Synopsis:Delaying the effective date of the Maryland Healthy Working Families Act until July 1, 2018.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Middleton, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Klausmeier, Hershey, Jennings, Mathias, Oaks, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Additional Facts:Bill is an Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Committee(s):
Finance  View Committee HearingEconomic Matters  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Private Sector Labor and Industry
Narrow Subject(s):Emergency Bills
Labor and Industry, Division of
Time
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Labor and Employment
(3-1304)
Article - Chapter of the Acts
(2018)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 14, 2018 5:16 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/22/20181/22/2018First Reading Finance
1/23/20181/23/2018Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
2/5/20182/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Favorable with Amendments {517171/119
Laid Over (Senator Manno) Adopted19
2/6/20182/6/2018Favorable with Amendments {517171/1 Finance20
Special Order until 2/7 (Senator Conway) Adopted 20
2/7/20182/7/2018Favorable with Amendments {517171/121
Committee Amendment {517171/1 Adopted (28-15)21
Favorable Report Adopted (28-16)21
Second Reading Passed with Amendments21
2/8/20182/8/2018Third Reading Passed (29-17)22
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Economic Matters23
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2/16/20182/16/2018Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 15, 2018 11:47 A.M.