SB0310

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Maryland Seal of Biliteracy Act - Establishment

Sponsored by:

Senator Rosapepe

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Establishing the Maryland Seal of Biliteracy Program; providing for the purpose of the Program; providing that participation in the Program by a local school system is voluntary; providing that, beginning with the graduating class of 2016, specified eligible students shall receive the Maryland Seal of Biliteracy affixed to a diploma or transcript under specified circumstances; requiring the State Board of Education to establish specified criteria and requirements on or before October 1, 2015; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Rosapepe, Madaleno, Bates, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Kagan, Kelley, King, Lee, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Montgomery, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Raskin, Reilly, Salling, Simonaire, Waugh, and Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0166
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Language
Public Schools
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Rules and Regulations
Students
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-208)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:48 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20152/5/2015First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
3/2/20153/2/2015Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/20153/3/2015Favorable Report Adopted34
Second Reading Passed34
3/5/20153/5/2015Third Reading Passed (46-0)36
House3/6/20153/6/2015First Reading Ways and Means38
3/10/20153/10/2015Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20153/17/2015Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:48 P.M.