SB0318 (CH0577)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Income Tax – Standard Deduction – Alteration and Cost–of–Living Adjustments

Sponsored by:

Senator Kasemeyer

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 577


Synopsis:Altering the determination of the amount of the standard deduction allowed for an individual under the Maryland income tax; altering the minimum and maximum limitation amounts of certain standard deductions allowed under the Maryland income tax for certain taxable years by a certain cost-of-living adjustment; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Kasemeyer, Madaleno, Serafini, Currie, Bates, DeGrange, Eckardt, Ferguson, Edwards, Guzzone, Hershey, King, Hough, McFadden, Jennings, Peters, Norman, Ready, Reilly, Salling, Simonaire, and Waugh
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1190
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Income
Narrow Subject(s):Income Tax
Sunset
Statutes:Article - Tax - General
(10-217)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 18, 2018 3:56 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/24/20181/24/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation
1/31/20181/31/2018Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20183/7/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/8/20183/8/2018Favorable with Amendments {499136/142
Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted42
3/9/20183/9/2018Favorable with Amendments {499136/143
Special Order until 3/12 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 43
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments {499136/1 Report Adopted44
Floor Amendment {433827/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (13-32)44
Floor Amendment {583924/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (13-32)44
Floor Amendment {363925/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (14-31)44
Floor Amendment {283527/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (14-31)44
Second Reading Passed with Amendments44
3/14/20183/14/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)46
House3/14/20183/11/2018First Reading Ways and Means45
3/16/20183/16/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/5/20183/27/2018Favorable with Amendments {155465/1 Report Adopted61A
Floor Amendment {523126/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (52-84)61A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61A
4/6/20183/28/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)62
Senate4/9/20184/2/2018Senate Concur - House Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (45-0)64
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/15/20185/15/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 577

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:16 P.M.