SB0334

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

The Hunger-Free Schools Act of 2015

Sponsored by:

Senator Madaleno

Status:

Veto sustained (0-46)


Synopsis:Altering a specified definition for fiscal years 2017 and 2018 to determine the number of students used to calculate the State compensatory education grant for schools that participate in the federal community eligibility provision for school meals; requiring the State Department of Education, the Department of Budget and Management, and the Department of Legislative Services to submit a specified report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2015; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Madaleno, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, King, Mathias, Montgomery, Currie, Manno, McFadden, and Peters
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0965
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee Hearing
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Budget and Management, Department of
Education, State Department of
Federal Government
Food -see also- Kosher; Meat, Poultry, Seafood; Milk
Grants
Legislative Services, Department of
Public Schools
Reports
State Aid
Statutes:Article - Education
(5-207)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:48 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/6/20152/6/2015First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/20152/11/2015Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
2/12/20152/12/2015Hearing cancelled
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
3/2/20153/2/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/3/20153/3/2015Favorable with Amendments {499235/1 Report Adopted34
Second Reading Passed with Amendments34
3/5/20153/5/2015Third Reading Passed (47-0)36
House3/6/20153/6/2015First Reading Ways and Means38
3/10/20153/10/2015Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20153/17/2015Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20154/2/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/2/20153/29/2015Favorable with Amendments {135267/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/3/20153/30/2015Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)60
Senate4/7/20153/31/2015Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments58
Senate Requests House Recede58
Conference Committee Appointed58
Senators Madaleno, Ferguson, and Eckardt58
House4/7/20154/1/2015House Refuses to Recede62
Conference Committee Appointed62
Delegates M. Washington, Hornberger, and Ebersole62
Senate4/9/20154/2/2015Conference Committee Report Adopted60
Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/9/20154/3/2015Conference Committee Report Adopted64
Third Reading Passed (138-0)64
Senate4/9/20154/2/2015Passed Enrolled64
Post Passage5/12/20155/12/2015Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate1/13/20161/13/2016Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
1/21/20161/21/2016Veto sustained (0-46)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:48 P.M.