SB0369

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public and Nonpublic Schools - Classwork and Assessment Involving Live and Dead Animals - Student Choice Policy

Sponsored by:

Senator Young

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


Synopsis:Authorizing a student in a public school or nonpublic school to choose not to participate in or observe, in whole or in part, classwork or an assessment that includes certain actions conducted on a certain animal; authorizing a student to choose not to participate in or observe the classwork or assessment at a certain time; requiring a certain student to complete the required classwork or assessment by a certain alternative educational method that meets certain requirements; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0544
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Animals -see also- Birds; Dogs
Discrimination
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Examinations
Notices
Private Schools
Public Schools
Students
Teachers
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-125)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 8, 2018 11:04 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/24/20181/24/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
1/26/20181/26/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 2/07 at 12:45 p.m.
2/19/20182/19/2018Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 16, 2018 2:49 P.M.