SB0376 (CH0144)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) Schools Act of 2016

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144


Synopsis:Establishing specified State-funded Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) schools in the State; authorizing specified planning grants for P-TECH schools; requiring specified P-TECH schools to reserve at least 50% of its available space for students who meet the free and reduced price meal income criteria; requiring the State to provide a specified grant to P-TECH schools beginning in fiscal year 2017 for P-TECH school costs; providing that the grant may not exceed a specified amount in specified fiscal years; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Jennings, Mathias, Muse, Norman, Ready, Reilly, Rosapepe, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, and Waugh
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0464
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means  View Committee Hearing
Appropriations
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Higher Education
Narrow Subject(s):Community Colleges
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Grants
Higher Education Commission
Industry and Technology
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Public Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Students
Tuition
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-1701)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:09 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/28/20161/28/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted12
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
4/7/20164/7/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/7/20164/1/2016Favorable with Amendments {754732/2 Report Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61A
4/8/20164/2/2016Third Reading Passed (43-1)62
House4/8/20164/2/2016First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations65
4/8/20164/8/2016Rereferred to Ways and Means and Appropriations
Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.
4/9/20164/9/2016Favorable Report by Ways and Means
4/9/20164/4/2016Favorable Report Adopted67
Second Reading Passed67
Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted (134-0)67
Third Reading Passed (133-1)67
Senate4/11/20164/3/2016Returned Passed63A
Post Passage4/26/20164/26/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:09 P.M.