SB0379 (CH0198)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy Bonds

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198


Synopsis:Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $4,680,000, the proceeds to be used as grants to the Interagency Committee on School Construction and the Maryland State Department of Education for the renovation, repair, and capital improvements of qualified zone academies; establishing that proceeds from the sale of qualified zone academy bonds may only be spent on costs that were eligible under the rules and regulations governing the program that were in effect on January 1, 2016; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:The President (By Request - Administration)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0463
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee HearingAppropriations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Capital Budget
Narrow Subject(s):Construction
Education, State Department of
Grants
Public Schools
State Bonds
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:09 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/28/20161/28/2016First Reading Budget and Taxation
Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted12
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20163/18/2016Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Favorable Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed47
3/21/20163/19/2016Third Reading Passed (45-0)48
House3/21/20163/19/2016First Reading Appropriations51
3/23/20163/23/2016Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20164/5/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
4/5/20163/29/2016Favorable with Amendments {184568/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/6/20163/30/2016Third Reading Passed with Amendments (126-9)62
Senate4/7/20164/1/2016Senate Concur - House Amendment61
Third Reading Passed (44-0)61
Passed Enrolled61
Post Passage4/26/20164/26/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:09 P.M.