SB0403

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health Centers

Sponsored by:

Senator Madaleno

Status:

Veto sustained (0-46)


Synopsis:Establishing the Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health Centers; requiring the Council to study and make recommendations on improving the health and educational outcomes of students who receive services from school-based health centers; authorizing the State Department of Education to seek the assistance of specified organizations to provide specified staffing resources; requiring the Council to report to specified entities on its findings and recommendations on or before December 31 of each year; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Madaleno and Ferguson
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0375
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingHealth and Government Operations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Dentists
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Health -see also- Mental Health
Health Care Facilities -see also- Clinics; Hospices; etc
Mental Health
Public Schools
Reports
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-4A-01, 7-4A-02, 7-4A-03, 7-4A-04, 7-4A-05)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:48 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/6/20152/6/2015First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/20152/11/2015Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20153/16/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/20153/17/2015Favorable with Amendments {114136/1 Report Adopted44
Second Reading Passed with Amendments44
3/18/20153/18/2015Third Reading Passed (46-0)45
House3/18/20153/15/2015First Reading Health and Government Operations45A
3/25/20153/25/2015Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20154/6/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
4/7/20154/1/2015Favorable with Amendments {806687/1 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
4/9/20154/3/2015Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-5)64
Senate4/11/20154/4/2015Senate Concur - House Amendments62
Third Reading Passed (46-0)62
Passed Enrolled62
Post Passage5/12/20155/12/2015Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate1/13/20161/13/2016Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
1/21/20161/21/2016Veto sustained (0-46)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:48 P.M.