SB0477 (CH0040)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Information Act - Required Denials - Physical Addresses, E-Mail Addresses, and Telephone Numbers

Sponsored by:

Senator Kagan

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40


Synopsis:Requiring a custodian to deny inspection of a distribution list and a request to be added to a distribution list that identifies a physical address, an e-mail address, or a telephone number of an individual that is used by a governmental entity or an elected official for the sole purpose of periodically sending news about certain activities or sending informational notices or emergency alerts; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Kagan, Astle, Bates, Benson, Brochin, Cassilly, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Edwards, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, Oaks, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Ready, Reilly, Robinson, Rosapepe, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, Smith, Waugh, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Bill is an Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0677
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingHealth and Government Operations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Narrow Subject(s):Electronic Communication -see also- Comm; Elec.Gov; Lang; Te
Emergency Bills
Emergencies
Identification
Inspections -see also- Motor Vehicle Inspection
Notices
Postal Service
Privacy
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Telephones
Statutes:Article - General Provisions
(4-341)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 12, 2018 4:36 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/26/20181/26/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
2/23/20182/23/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/20182/26/2018Favorable Report Adopted34
Second Reading Passed34
2/28/20182/28/2018Third Reading Passed (47-0)36
House3/1/20183/1/2018First Reading Health and Government Operations37
3/7/20183/7/2018Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/26/20183/26/2018Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
3/27/20183/20/2018Favorable Report Adopted54
Second Reading Passed54
3/28/20183/21/2018Third Reading Passed (133-5)55
Senate4/9/20184/2/2018Returned Passed64
Post Passage4/10/20184/10/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2018 12:59 P.M.