SB0508

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Interaction With Law Enforcement Officers - Development and Implementation of Curriculum Content

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation


Synopsis:Requiring that a driver's license examination require an applicant to demonstrate the applicant's ability to take proper actions during a traffic stop; requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to include content in the standardized driver education curriculum on the proper interaction between individuals and law enforcement officers during stops; requiring the Administration to develop the curriculum content in consultation with the Maryland Commission on Civil Rights and the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Waugh and Conway
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingEnvironment and Transportation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Public Safety
Primary and Secondary Education
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Curriculum
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Board of
Job Training -see also- Continuing Education
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Traffic Regulation
Statutes:Article - Transportation
(16-110, 16-505)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 11, 2018 2:05 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/29/20181/29/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
3/14/20183/14/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/20183/15/2018Favorable with Amendments {674735/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20183/17/2018Third Reading Passed (47-0)48C
House3/20/20183/16/2018First Reading Environment and Transportation50
3/22/20183/22/2018Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20184/7/2018Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 6, 2018 6:06 P.M.