SB0515

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Career and Technology Education and Workforce Investment Act

Sponsored by:

Senator Currie

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. (Appropriations)


Synopsis:Establishing the Career and Technology Education Grant Program to provide grants for the capital equipping of school facilities used to provide a certain career and technology program; requiring the Interagency Committee on School Construction to implement and administer the Program; requiring the Interagency Committee to award certain grants to county boards of education and to develop application procedures and eligibility requirements under the Program; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Currie, Rosapepe, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Manno, Mathias, Middleton, Peters, Ramirez, Smith, Young, McFadden, and Muse
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1098
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee HearingAppropriations  View Committee Hearing
Ways and Means
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Construction
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Federal Government
Governor
Grants
Industry and Technology
Public Buildings and Facilities -see also- Stadiums; St Hse
Public Schools
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Education
(5-314)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 20, 2018 4:23 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/29/20181/29/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation
1/31/20181/31/2018Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/5/20183/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/6/20183/6/2018Favorable with Amendments {699338/1 Report Adopted40
Floor Amendment {903824/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/8/20183/8/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)42
House3/9/20183/9/2018First Reading Appropriations and Ways and Means43
3/14/20183/14/2018Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
3/19/20183/19/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. (Appropriations)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 19, 2018 1:34 P.M.