SB0517

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Career Apprenticeship Investment Act

Sponsored by:

Senator Rosapepe

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. (Appropriations)


Synopsis:Authorizing the Governor to provide an additional $2,000,000 annually, in addition to the $1,000,000 annual appropriation, to the Maryland Higher Education Commission for Workforce Development Sequence Scholarships; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to create a statewide media campaign to promote participation in career and technical education, apprenticeships, and workforce development in workforce shortage occupations in the State; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Rosapepe, Astle, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Peters, Ramirez, Robinson, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1226
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018, October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Finance  View Committee HearingAppropriations  View Committee Hearing
Economic Matters
Broad Subject(s):Private Sector Labor and Industry
Education - Miscellaneous
Taxes - Income
Narrow Subject(s):Advertising
Apprentices
Appropriations
Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Continuing Education -see also- Job Training
Cybersecurity -see also- Safety
Governor
Higher Education Commission
Industry and Technology
Job Training -see also- Continuing Education
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Video
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Youth -see also- Minors
Statutes:Article - Education
(18-3303, 18-1905.2)
Article - Labor and Employment
(11-410)
Article - Tax - General
(10-742)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 20, 2018 4:23 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/29/20181/29/2018First Reading Finance
1/31/20181/31/2018Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/5/20183/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/6/20183/6/2018Favorable with Amendments {537274/1 Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/8/20183/8/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)42
House3/9/20183/9/2018First Reading Appropriations and Economic Matters43
3/14/20183/14/2018Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
3/19/20183/19/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. (Appropriations)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 19, 2018 1:36 P.M.