SB0520 (CH0397)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

County Boards of Education - School Buses - Motor Fuel Tax Exemption and Refund

Sponsored by:

Washington County Senators

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397


Synopsis:Providing an exemption from the motor fuel tax for motor fuel that is bought by a county board of education or a school bus operator under contract with a county board of education for use in a school bus; authorizing a county board of education to claim a refund of a motor fuel tax paid on motor fuel purchased for use in a school bus used to transport the county's public school students; authorizing a specified school bus operator to claim a refund of a motor fuel tax paid for specified purposes; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Washington County Senators
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0756
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Transportation
Narrow Subject(s):Contractors -see also- Heating & Cooling; Home Improvement
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Education, Boards of
Fuel Tax
Motor Vehicles -see also- Aband Veh; Ambulances; Buses; etc.
School Buses
Washington County
Statutes:Article - Tax - General
(13-901, 9-303)
Article - Transportation
(11-153, 11-154, 11-173)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:09 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/4/20162/4/2016First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/5/20162/5/2016Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20163/7/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/8/20163/8/2016Favorable with Amendments {129338/1 Report Adopted39
Second Reading Passed with Amendments39
3/10/20163/10/2016Third Reading Passed (46-0)41
House3/11/20163/11/2016First Reading Ways and Means43
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20164/6/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/6/20163/30/2016Favorable with Amendments {395367/1 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
4/7/20164/1/2016Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)64
Senate4/9/20164/3/2016Senate Concur - House Amendments63
Third Reading Passed (43-0)63
Passed Enrolled63
Post Passage5/10/20165/10/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:09 P.M.