SB0533

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Assessments - Administration and Provision of Information

Sponsored by:

Senator Pinsky

Status:

Veto sustained (0-46)


Synopsis:Extending to the 2018-2019 school year the period of time by which the State Department of Education is required to develop a specified assessment in the State's adopted curricula for a core content area; requiring each county board of education to provide information relating to each assessment administered in a local school system that includes the title, purpose, grade level or subject area tested, testing window, and accommodations for students with special needs; requiring this information to be updated annually; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Pinsky
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0412
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Assessments
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Electronic Government
Examinations
Language
Reports
Special Education
Students
Time
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-203, 7-203.3)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:09 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/4/20162/4/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20163/14/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/20163/15/2016Favorable with Amendments {504438/1 Report Adopted44
Second Reading Passed with Amendments44
3/16/20163/16/2016Third Reading Passed (34-10)45
House3/17/20163/14/2016First Reading Ways and Means46
3/22/20163/22/2016Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20163/23/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
3/24/20163/24/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
4/8/20164/8/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/8/20164/2/2016Favorable with Amendments {845367/1 Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed with Amendments65
4/9/20164/4/2016Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0)67
Senate4/11/20164/5/2016Senate Concur - House Amendment65
Third Reading Passed (46-0)65
Passed Enrolled65
Post Passage5/27/20165/27/2016Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate1/18/20171/18/2017Veto sustained (0-46)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:09 P.M.