SB0538

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Blind or Visually Impaired Children - Individualized Education Programs - Orientation and Mobility Instruction

Sponsored by:

Senator Conway

Status:

Veto sustained (0-46)


Synopsis:Requiring individualized education programs for blind or visually impaired children to provide orientation and mobility instruction under specified circumstances; establishing a specified process for a specified individualized education program team to make a specified determination as to whether specified orientation and mobility instruction is appropriate for a specified child and to include it in a specified child's individualized education program; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Conway and Middleton
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0535
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Narrow Subject(s):Assessments
Blind Persons
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Local Government Mandates
Notices
Public Employees -see also- State Employees
Rules and Regulations
Special Education
Students
Teachers
Statutes:Article - Education
(8-408)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:49 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/6/20152/6/2015First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/20152/11/2015Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
3/9/20153/9/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/20153/10/2015Favorable with Amendments {894931/1 Report Adopted39
Second Reading Passed with Amendments39
3/12/20153/12/2015Third Reading Passed (47-0)41
House3/13/20153/13/2015First Reading Ways and Means43
3/16/20153/16/2015Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20153/17/2015Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20154/2/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/2/20153/29/2015Favorable with Amendments {195268/1 Report Adopted59
Special Order until 4/3 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 59
4/3/20153/30/2015Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/8/20154/2/2015Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-1)63
Senate4/11/20154/4/2015Senate Concur - House Amendments62
Third Reading Passed (46-0)62
Passed Enrolled62
Post Passage5/12/20155/12/2015Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate1/13/20161/13/2016Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
1/21/20161/21/2016Veto sustained (0-46)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:49 P.M.