SB0544 (CH0401)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Motor Vehicle Insurance - Insurance Identification Card - Carrying Proof of Coverage - Uninsured Motorist Education and Enforcement Fund

Sponsored by:

Senator Middleton

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401


Synopsis:Requiring an insurer to provide a specified insurance identification card to specified insureds at specified times; providing that an insurance identification card may be produced in a specified electronic format; requiring a specified operator to be in possession of evidence of required security; requiring that a specified operator is subject to a fine of $50 under specified circumstances; establishing the Uninsured Motorist Education and Enforcement Fund; exempting the fund from a specified provision of law; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Middleton, Reilly, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Jennings, Kelley, Klausmeier, and Mathias
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0720
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Finance  View Committee HearingEconomic Matters
Broad Subject(s):Insurance - Other than Health
Narrow Subject(s):Comptroller
Driver Education
Electronic Government
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Evidence
Exemptions
Fines -see also- Penalties and Sentences
Gifts
Grants
Identification
Insurance -see also- Health Ins; MAIF; Motor Vehicle Ins
Interest
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Liability -see also- Good Samaritan
Motor Vehicles -see also- Aband Veh; Ambulances; Buses; etc.
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Insurance -see also- MD Auto Insurance Fund
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Treasurers
Statutes:Article - Insurance
(19-503.1)
Article - Transportation
(17-104.2)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:09 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/4/20162/4/2016First Reading Finance
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
3/21/20163/21/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/21/20163/18/2016Favorable with Amendments {237377/1 Report Adopted47A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47A
3/21/20163/19/2016Third Reading Passed (44-0)48A
House3/22/20163/20/2016First Reading Economic Matters52
3/29/20163/29/2016Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/29/20163/24/2016Favorable Report Adopted56
Second Reading Passed56
3/30/20163/25/2016Third Reading Passed (137-0)57
Senate3/31/20163/27/2016Returned Passed56
Post Passage5/10/20165/10/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:09 P.M.