SB0570 (CH0312)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Visual Impairments – Requirements for Student Vision Screening and Information (Atticus Act)

Sponsored by:

Senator Bates

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312


Synopsis:Requiring certain vision screenings to be given in certain years to certain students unless evidence is presented that the student has been tested by an optometrist or ophthalmologist within the past year; requiring the results of certain screening be given to the parents or guardians of each student along with certain educational materials; requiring that additional information provided to parents or guardians of students who fail a vision screening include recommendations for follow-up and medical assistance programs; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Bates, Klausmeier, Robinson, Salling, and Smith
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Assessments
Blind Persons
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Continuing Education -see also- Job Training
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Data -see also- Census; Demographics
Disclosure
Education, Boards of
Evidence
Examinations
Forms
Health -see also- Mental and Behavioral Health
Health, Department of
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Job Training -see also- Continuing Education
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Local Government Mandates
Medical Assistance
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Ophthalmologists
Optometrists
Parents and Guardians -see also- Adoption; Child Custody
Private Schools
Public Information
Public Schools
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Students
Teachers
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-404)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 11, 2018 2:04 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/31/20181/31/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/20183/28/2018Favorable with Amendments {364935/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/3/20183/29/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)60
House4/3/20183/25/2018First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations59
4/4/20184/5/2018Rereferred to Ways and Means
4/5/20184/5/2018Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20184/7/2018Favorable Report by Ways and Means
4/7/20183/30/2018Favorable Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed64
4/9/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed (136-0)66
Senate4/9/20184/3/2018Returned Passed65
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:57 P.M.