SB0575 (CH0680)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

County Boards of Education - Limit on Liability

Sponsored by:

Senator Ramirez

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 680


Synopsis:Increasing to $400,000 per claim the limit on liability of a county board of education; increasing to $400,000 per occurrence the minimum amount of liability coverage that a county board must maintain and for which the State Board of Education must establish standards; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Ramirez
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  View Committee HearingJudiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Civil Actions and Procedures
Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Insurance -see also- Health Ins; MAIF; Motor Vehicle Ins
Liability -see also- Good Samaritan
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(5-518)
Article - Education
(4-105)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:09 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/4/20162/4/2016First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20163/7/2016Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/8/20163/8/2016Favorable Report Adopted39
Second Reading Passed39
3/10/20163/10/2016Third Reading Passed (32-14)41
House3/11/20163/11/2016First Reading Judiciary43
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
4/9/20164/9/2016Favorable Report by Judiciary
4/9/20164/3/2016Favorable Report Adopted66A
Second Reading Passed66A
4/9/20164/4/2016Third Reading Passed (102-31)67
Senate4/11/20164/3/2016Returned Passed63A
Post Passage5/28/20165/28/2016Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 680

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:09 P.M.