SB0610

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Task Force on the Forest Conservation Act Offset Policy

Sponsored by:

Senator Young

Status:

In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (103-36)


Synopsis:Establishing the Task Force on the Forest Conservation Act Offset Policy to study and review certain issues related to certain changes to forested lands in the State due to certain circumstances; requiring the Task Force to develop findings and recommendations regarding forest conservation in Maryland and to report to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2018; authorizing the Task Force to consult with the Chesapeake Bay Program, the U.S. Forest Service, and certain governmental entities and academic institutions; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Young, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, King, Lee, Madaleno, Nathan-Pulliam, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0766
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingEnvironment and Transportation
Broad Subject(s):Natural Resources - Generally
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Conservation -see also- Soil Conservation
Foresters
Forests and Parks -see also- Program Open Space; Trees
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Publications -see also- Maryland Register
Reports
Sunset
Trees
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 11, 2018 2:05 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/31/20181/31/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/15/20183/15/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments {994034/148
Special Order until 3/19 (Senator Young) Adopted 48
3/19/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments {994034/148B
Special Order until 3/26 (Senator Young) Adopted 48b
3/26/20183/22/2018Favorable with Amendments {994034/153
Committee Amendment Withdrawn53
Favorable Report Adopted53
Floor Amendment {903729/1 (Senator Young)53
Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted53
3/27/20183/23/2018Floor Amendment {903729/1 (Senator Young)54
Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (18-29)54
Floor Amendment {903729/1 (Senator Young) Adopted54
Floor Amendment {183425/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted54
Special Order until later today (Senator Bates) Adopted 54
Floor Amendment {823624/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected54
Second Reading Passed with Amendments54
3/28/20183/24/2018Third Reading Passed (36-10)55
House3/29/20183/22/2018First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations56
4/4/20184/5/2018Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
4/9/20184/9/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
4/9/20184/1/2018Favorable with Amendments {840312/1 Report Adopted66
Second Reading Passed with Amendments66
4/9/20184/2/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (103-36)67

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 9, 2018 5:15 P.M.