SB0611 (CH0561)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education – Healthy School Facility Fund – Established

Sponsored by:

Senator Conway

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561


Synopsis:Establishing the Healthy School Facility Fund to provide grants to public primary and secondary schools in the State to improve the health of school facilities; requiring the Interagency Committee on School Construction to establish award procedures to make awards distributed from the Fund not more than 45 days after receiving an application; requiring the Governor in each of fiscal years 2020 and 2021 to appropriate at least $30,000,000 to the Fund; requiring the Comptroller to account for the Fund; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Conway, McFadden, Ferguson, Madaleno, Manno, Nathan-Pulliam, Rosapepe, Young, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Bill is an Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingAppropriations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Construction
Emergency Bills
Grants
Heating and Cooling
Interest
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Statutes:Article - Education
(5-314)
Article - State Finance and Procurement
(6-226)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 11, 2018 4:30 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/31/20181/31/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2/15/20182/15/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Favorable with Amendments {914231/1 Report Adopted48A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48A
3/19/20183/17/2018Third Reading Passed (36-11)48C
House3/20/20183/16/2018First Reading Appropriations50
3/23/20183/23/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20184/3/2018Favorable Report by Appropriations
4/3/20183/25/2018Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/4/20183/26/2018Third Reading Passed (105-33)60
Senate4/5/20183/31/2018Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:37 P.M.