SB0618

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Career Youth and Public Sector Apprenticeship Act

Sponsored by:

Senator Klausmeier

Status:

In the House - Conference Committee Appointed


Synopsis:Authorizing a county board of education to award credit to a high school student who completes work-based training or classroom instruction under a registered apprenticeship program; authorizing a county board to count toward high school attendance the time certain apprentices spend during certain work-based training with certain employers; requiring the State Board of Education to report on progress, by high school and community college, toward the attainment of certain goals; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Klausmeier, Rosapepe, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kelley, Middleton, Peters, Ramirez, Robinson, Smith, and Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1234
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Finance
Ways and Means  View Committee Hearing
Appropriations
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Private Sector Labor and Industry
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Personnel
Higher Education
Narrow Subject(s):Apprentices
Budget and Management, Department of
Credit
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Board of
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Job Training -see also- Continuing Education
Public Schools
Reports
Salaries and Compensation -see also- Overtime; Reimb. Rates
Students
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Education
(21-204, 15-123, 7-205.4, 7-301.2)
Article - Labor and Employment
(11-103)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 29, 2018 3:51 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20182/1/2018First Reading Finance
2/2/20182/2/2018Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance18
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Favorable with Amendments {554734/1 Report Adopted48A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48A
3/19/20183/17/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)48C
House3/20/20183/16/2018First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations50
3/20/20183/20/2018Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/5/20183/27/2018Favorable with Amendments {185669/1 Report Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61A
4/6/20183/29/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0)63
Senate4/9/20184/4/2018Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments66
Senate Requests House Recede66
House4/9/20184/4/2018House Refuses to Recede69
Conference Committee Appointed69
Delegates Luedtke, Wilkins, and Rose69

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 9, 2018 11:37 P.M.