SB0638

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Research-Based Reading Instruction

Sponsored by:

Senator Conway

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Requiring the Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board, on or before January 1, 2022, to require a candidate for a certificate to teach certain students to pass a test of research-based reading instruction; requiring the Board and the State Board of Education jointly to select the test and set the passing score for the test, subject to a certain condition; requiring the Board and the State Board jointly to set standards for the delivery of research-based reading instruction by teacher preparation programs in the State; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Conway, Madaleno, Robinson, Rosapepe, Waugh, and Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0493
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Board of
Examinations
Language -see also- Communication; Electronic Comm; Telecomm
Literacy
Special Education
Teachers
Statutes:Article - Education
(6-704.2, 6-709)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 1, 2018 10:52 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20182/1/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/20182/7/2018Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 7, 2018 2:24 P.M.