SB0639 (CH0013)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Public School Personnel - Disciplinary Hearing Procedures

Sponsored by:

Senator Guzzone

Status:

Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 13


Synopsis:Altering certain procedures for suspending or dismissing certain public school personnel; authorizing certain public school personnel to request a hearing before the county board or arbitration under certain circumstances; specifying the procedures for arbitration; assigning responsibility to the individual for 50% of the cost and expenses of the arbitration and 50% to the county board; providing that an arbitrator's decision and award is final and binding on the parties, subject to review by a circuit court; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Guzzone, Benson, Feldman, Kagan, Kasemeyer, King, Madaleno, Manno, Middleton, Nathan-Pulliam, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1758
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Arbitration -see also- Mediation
Circuit Courts
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Discipline
Education, Boards of
Hearings
Judicial Review -see also- Appeals
Local Government Mandates
Notices
Public Schools
School Administration
Teachers
Statutes:Article - Education
(6-202)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 12, 2018 1:38 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20182/1/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/20182/7/2018Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20183/14/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/20183/15/2018Favorable Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed47
3/19/20183/17/2018Third Reading Passed (34-13)48C
House3/20/20183/16/2018First Reading Ways and Means50
3/20/20183/20/2018Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22/20183/22/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20183/28/2018Hearing canceled
3/29/20183/29/2018Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/29/20183/22/2018Favorable Report Adopted56
Second Reading Passed56
3/30/20183/23/2018Third Reading Passed (88-48)57
Senate4/5/20183/24/2018Returned Passed58
Post Passage4/4/20184/4/2018Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Senate4/5/20183/31/2018Veto overridden (32-14)62
House4/5/20183/27/2018Veto overridden (89-49)61
Post Passage4/5/20184/5/2018Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 13

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 5, 2018 5:53 P.M.