SB0641 (CH0067)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Kathleen A. Mathias Oral Chemotherapy Improvement Act of 2014

Sponsored by:

Senator Mathias

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67


Synopsis:Altering the scope of specified provisions of law relating to coverage of cancer chemotherapy to include specified policies or contracts issued or delivered by specified entities that provide essential health benefits required under specified provisions of federal law; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Mathias, Pugh, Raskin, Astle, Brinkley, Feldman, Glassman, Kelley, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Middleton, and Ramirez
Additional Facts:Bill is an Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0625
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Committee(s):
Finance   View Committee HearingHealth and Government Operations
Broad Subject(s):Insurance - Health
Narrow Subject(s):Diseases -see also- AIDS; Rabies
Drugs -see also- Controlled Dangerous Sub; Substance Abuse
Emergency Bills
Health Insurance -see also- HMOS; Managed Care Organizations
Health Maintenance Organizations -see also- Manage Care Orgs
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 2, 2015 9:05 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/30/20141/30/2014First Reading Finance
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2/28/20142/28/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/3/20143/3/2014Favorable with Amendments {187677/1 Report Adopted37
Second Reading Passed with Amendments37
3/5/20143/5/2014Third Reading Passed (46-0)39
House3/5/20143/5/2014First Reading Health and Government Operations41
3/10/20143/10/2014Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20143/14/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/14/20143/11/2014Favorable with Amendments {296786/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/17/20143/13/2014Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)49
Senate3/17/20143/12/2014Senate Concur - House Amendments46
Third Reading Passed (46-0)46
Passed Enrolled46
Post Passage4/8/20144/8/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 8, 2014 12:16 P.M.