SB0657

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Workgroup on Establishing an Independent School Board for the Juvenile Services Education System

Sponsored by:

Senator Kelley

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Establishing a Workgroup on Establishing an Independent School Board for the Juvenile Services Education System to determine whether to create an independent school board for the Juvenile Services Education System, and identify ways to reform and improve juvenile education services; requiring the Workgroup to convene on or before September 1, 2018; requiring the Workgroup to submit a certain report to the Governor and the General Assembly in a certain format by December 20, 2019; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Kelley, Benson, Cassilly, Conway, Currie, Ferguson, Guzzone, Hough, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, Pinsky, Ramirez, Ready, Robinson, Rosapepe, Serafini, Smith, Waugh, and Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1244
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Juvenile Services, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Reports
Sunset
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 1, 2018 10:52 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20182/1/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/2/20182/2/2018Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 2, 2018 12:21 P.M.