SB0725 (CH0366)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Bullying, Cyberbullying, Harassment, and Intimidation – School Response

Sponsored by:

Senator Zirkin

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366


Synopsis:Authorizing a school principal to make a report to a law enforcement agency if, after an investigation is completed, the principal has reason to believe that a student has engaged in conduct that constitutes a certain criminal offense; requiring certain school policies prohibiting bullying, harassment, or intimidation to include procedures for providing notice of an act of bullying, harassment, or intimidation to a parent or guardian of the alleged victim and of the alleged perpetrator within 5 days after the act is reported; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Zirkin, Brochin, Cassilly, Hough, Kelley, Lee, Muse, Norman, Ramirez, Ready, and Smith
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  View Committee Hearing
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Judiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Civil Actions and Procedures
Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Assault
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Electronic Communication -see also- Comm; Elec.Gov; Lang; Te
Harassment -see also- Threats
Investigations and Inquiries -see also- Crim Bckgrnd Invest
Liability -see also- Good Samaritan
Notices
Parents and Guardians -see also- Adoption; Child Custody
Private Schools
Protection Orders
Public Schools
School Administration
Sexual Offenses
Students
Threats -see also- Harrassment; Violence
Victims -see also- Criminal Injuries Compensation
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(5-643)
Article - Education
(7-424, 7-424.1, 7-424.3, 7-303.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 3:41 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/2/20182/2/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/5/20182/5/2018Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs19
2/7/20182/7/2018Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
3/5/20183/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/6/20183/6/2018Favorable with Amendments {428777/1 Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/8/20183/8/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)42
House3/9/20183/9/2018First Reading Judiciary43
3/14/20183/14/2018Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/9/20184/9/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
4/9/20184/4/2018Favorable with Amendments {992116/1 Report Adopted69
Second Reading Passed with Amendments69
Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Dumais) Adopted (130-6)69
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-4)69
Senate4/9/20184/5/2018Senate Concur - House Amendments67
Third Reading Passed (46-0)67
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:33 P.M.