SB0739

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Board of Education - Membership - Teachers and Parent

Sponsored by:

Senator Madaleno

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)


Synopsis:Altering the membership of the State Board of Education to add two regular members who are certified teachers with certain experience and a parent of a student enrolled in a public school; prohibiting the two teacher members from being employed by the same county board of education; requiring the Governor to appoint certain teacher members with the advice and consent of the Senate from certain lists; authorizing certain teacher members to attend and participate in executive sessions of the State Board; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Madaleno, Benson, Guzzone, King, Lee, Manno, McFadden, Smith, and Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0154
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0609 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Elections -see also- Ballots; Camp Financ; Pol Cands; Voting
Governor
Notices
Parents and Guardians -see also- Adoption; Child Custody
Public Officials -see also- Atty Gen; Compt; Coun Admin; etc
Rules and Regulations
Teachers
Voting -see also- Ballots; Elections
Statutes:Article - Education
(2-202)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 14, 2018 4:30 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20182/5/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/2/20182/2/2018Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22/20183/22/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/20183/20/2018Favorable with Amendments {564630/1 Report Adopted51
Second Reading Passed with Amendments51
3/23/20183/21/2018Third Reading Passed (37-10)52
House3/26/20183/19/2018First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations53
3/28/20183/28/2018Rereferred to Ways and Means
3/29/20183/29/2018Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/5/20183/27/2018Favorable with Amendments {915864/1 Report Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61A
4/6/20183/28/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (91-46)62
Senate4/9/20184/2/2018Senate Concur - House Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (33-12)64
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/25/20185/25/2018Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 29, 2018 3:54 P.M.