SB0760

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Grounds for Discipline

Sponsored by:

Senator Guzzone

Status:

In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations


Synopsis:Altering specified procedures for suspending or dismissing specified public school personnel; authorizing specified public school personnel to request arbitration under specified circumstances; specifying the procedures for arbitration; assigning responsibility to the individual for 25% of the cost and expenses of the arbitration and 75% to the county board; and providing that an arbitrator's award is final and binding on the parties, subject to review by a circuit court.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Guzzone, Benson, Feldman, King, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, Middleton, Ramirez, Young, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0497
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingRules and Executive Nominations
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Arbitration -see also- Mediation
Circuit Courts
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Discipline
Education, Boards of
Hearings
Judicial Review -see also- Appeals
Notices
Teachers
Statutes:Article - Education
(6-202)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:12 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/3/20172/3/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/20172/8/2017Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20173/20/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/20173/17/2017Favorable with Amendments {864532/146A
Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted46A
3/21/20173/19/2017Favorable with Amendments {864532/1 Report Adopted (32-14)48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/22/20173/20/2017Third Reading Passed (32-15)49
House3/23/20173/20/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations54

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:12 P.M.