SB0764 (CH0229)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Student Journalists - Freedom of Speech and Freedom of the Press

Sponsored by:

Senator Raskin

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229


Synopsis:Authorizing student journalists at public schools and public institutions of higher education to exercise freedom of speech and freedom of the press in school-sponsored media; specifying that these freedoms are not limited by the fact that the media is supported financially by the school system, the school, or the institution of higher education, or by use of the facilities of the school; prohibiting student media advisors from using their position to influence a student journalist to promote specified positions; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Raskin and Rosapepe
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingAppropriations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Higher Education
Narrow Subject(s):Censorship
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Discipline
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Harassment
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Libel and Slander
News Media
Photography
Privacy
Public Schools
Safety -see also- Occupational Safety
State Universities and Colleges
Statutes:Article - Education
(15-119, 7-121)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:10 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20162/5/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20163/14/2016Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/20163/15/2016Favorable44
Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 44
3/16/20163/16/2016Favorable45
Special Order until 3/17 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 45
3/17/20163/17/2016Favorable Report Adopted46
Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {573427/1 Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/18/20163/18/2016Third Reading Passed (36-10)47
House3/21/20163/18/2016First Reading Appropriations50
3/23/20163/23/2016Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20164/5/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
4/5/20163/29/2016Favorable with Amendments {894963/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/6/20163/30/2016Floor Amendment (Delegate Kittleman) {123825/1 Adopted62
Special Order until 4/7 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 62
4/7/20164/1/2016Motion Reconsider Floor Amendment {123825/1 Adopted64
Motion Withdrawn Floor Amendment {123825/1 Adopted64
Floor Amendment (Delegate Kittleman) {933720/1 Adopted64
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (129-8)64
Senate4/9/20164/3/2016Senate Concur - House Amendments63
Third Reading Passed (37-9)63
Passed Enrolled63
Post Passage4/26/20164/26/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:10 P.M.