SB0770 (CH0230)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Public High Schools - Agriculture Science

Sponsored by:

Senator Bates

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230


Synopsis:Encouraging each county board of education, beginning in the 2018-2019 school year, to implement a specified agriculture science curriculum in at least one public high school in each county or at least one career and technology education center in each county; and requiring that the agriculture science curriculum be selected from existing curricula developed by the State Department of Education or be developed by a county board and approved by the Department.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Bates and Norman
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1297
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Agriculture -see also- Farmland
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Job Training
Public Schools
Statutes:Article - Education
(4-111.3)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:10 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20162/5/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2/29/20162/29/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/20163/1/2016Favorable with Amendments {404135/1 Report Adopted34
Second Reading Passed with Amendments34
3/3/20163/3/2016Third Reading Passed (47-0)36
House3/4/20163/4/2016First Reading Ways and Means38
3/11/20163/11/2016Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
4/8/20164/8/2016Favorable Report by Ways and Means
4/9/20164/3/2016Favorable Report Adopted66A
Second Reading Passed66A
4/9/20164/4/2016Third Reading Passed (135-1)67
Senate4/11/20164/3/2016Returned Passed63A
Post Passage4/26/20164/26/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:10 P.M.