SB0781 (CH0232)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Maryland Seal of Biliteracy Act - Establishment

Sponsored by:

Senator Rosapepe

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232


Synopsis:Establishing the Maryland Seal of Biliteracy Program; providing for the purpose of the Program; providing that participation in the Program by a local school system is voluntary; providing that, beginning with the graduating class of 2017, specified eligible students shall receive the Maryland Seal of Biliteracy affixed to a diploma or transcript under specified circumstances; requiring the State Board of Education to establish specified criteria and requirements on or before October 1, 2016; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Rosapepe, Bates, Conway, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Peters, Ramirez, Raskin, Salling, Simonaire, and Waugh
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0708
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0310 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Board of
Language
Public Schools
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Rules and Regulations
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-208)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:10 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20162/5/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2/29/20162/29/2016Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/20163/1/2016Favorable Report Adopted34
Second Reading Passed34
3/3/20163/3/2016Third Reading Passed (47-0)36
House3/4/20163/4/2016First Reading Ways and Means38
3/11/20163/11/2016Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
4/9/20164/9/2016Favorable Report by Ways and Means
4/9/20164/4/2016Favorable Report Adopted67
Second Reading Passed67
4/11/20164/5/2016Third Reading Passed (136-5)68
Senate4/11/20164/5/2016Returned Passed65
Post Passage4/26/20164/26/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:10 P.M.