SB0786 (CH0611)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Restraint and Seclusion - Consideration and Reporting

Sponsored by:

Senator Zucker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 611


Synopsis:Requiring the State Superintendent of Schools to convene a task force to consider the circumstances under which, and the schools or types of schools in which, restraint and seclusion shall be prohibited and to consider contraindications for restraint and seclusion and who may authorize restraint and seclusion; providing for the composition of the task force; requiring the task force to review existing regulations concerning seclusion and to make specified recommendations to the State Board and the General Assembly by October 1, 2017; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Zucker, Conway, Guzzone, Kagan, Nathan-Pulliam, Robinson, and Smith
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0331
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017, June 30, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Discipline
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Health -see also- Mental and Behavioral Health
Private Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety -see also- Cybersecurity; Occupational Safety
Special Education
Students
Teachers
Time
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-1101 through 7-1104, 7-1102, 7-1102.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:12 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/3/20172/3/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/20172/8/2017Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
3/27/20173/27/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/20173/23/2017Favorable with Amendments {654030/1 Report Adopted52
Second Reading Passed with Amendments52
3/28/20173/24/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)53
House3/28/20173/23/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations57
4/4/20174/5/2017Rereferred to Ways and Means
4/4/20174/4/2017Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20174/6/2017Favorable Report by Ways and Means
4/6/20173/30/2017Favorable Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed64
4/8/20174/1/2017Third Reading Passed (139-0)66
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 611

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:12 P.M.