SB0788

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Information Act - Revisions

Sponsored by:

Senator Kagan

Status:

In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)


Synopsis:Providing that, except as otherwise provided by law, the Public Information Act does not authorize a custodian of records to allow the inspection of the Social Security number or date of birth of an individual except to a person in interest; requiring, except under certain circumstances, a custodian to deny inspection of a certain part of a personal surveillance video; requiring that a victim who is the subject of a record that is denied inspection be notified of all requests to inspect the record; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Kagan, Bates, Feldman, Guzzone, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Ready, Smith, and Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1638
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Narrow Subject(s):Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Death -see also- Advance Medical Directives; Wrongful Death
Domestic Violence -see also- Child Abuse & Neglect
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Legislation -see also- Correct Leg; Cur Leg; Emerg Bills
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
News Media
Notices
Police Training Commission
Privacy
Public Employees -see also- State Employees
Public Information
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Sexual Offenses
Social Security
State Employees
Victims -see also- Criminal Injuries Compensation
Video
Statutes:Article - General Provisions
(4-101, 4-103, 4-327.1, 4-341)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 20, 2018 10:49 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20182/5/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20183/14/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/20183/15/2018Favorable with Amendments {424933/147
Laid Over (Senator Zirkin) Adopted47
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments {424933/148
Special Order until later today (Senator Smith) Adopted 48
Favorable with Amendments {424933/1 Report Adopted48A
Floor Amendment {873425/2 (Senator Hough) Adopted48A
Floor Amendment {873425/3 (Senator Hough) Adopted (37-6)48A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48A
3/19/20183/17/2018Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Smith) Adopted 48C
3/20/20183/18/2018Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)49

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 20, 2018 10:49 A.M.