SB0794 (CH0427)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Prekindergarten and Kindergarten Assessments - Administration

Sponsored by:

Senator Jennings

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427


Synopsis:Requiring a statewide kindergarten assessment to be limited to a representative sample of kindergarten students from within each local school system in the State, subject to a specified exception; authorizing a specified kindergarten assessment to evaluate specified skills; authorizing specified county boards of education and specified principals and teachers to administer a specified statewide kindergarten assessment if the assessment is completed by October 1 and the aggregate results are returned within 45 days; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Jennings, Kagan, Klausmeier, Waugh, Young, Zucker, and Salling
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0657
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Assessments
Collective Bargaining
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Examinations
Psychologists
Public Schools
Salaries and Compensation -see also- Overtime; Reimb. Rates
Students
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-208)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:10 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20162/5/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20163/14/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/20163/15/2016Favorable with Amendments {694432/144
Laid Over (Senator Ferguson) Adopted44
3/16/20163/16/2016Favorable with Amendments {694432/1 Report Adopted45
Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {213829/1 Adopted45
Special Order until later today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 45
Special Order until 3/17 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 45
3/17/20163/17/2016Special Order until later today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 46
Floor Amendment (Senator Ferguson) {733922/1 Adopted46
Floor Amendment (Senator Ferguson) {483527/2 Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/18/20163/18/2016Third Reading Passed (46-0)47
House3/21/20163/18/2016First Reading Ways and Means50
3/22/20163/22/2016Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20163/23/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
3/24/20163/24/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20164/4/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/4/20163/28/2016Favorable with Amendments {365767/1 Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/5/20163/29/2016Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)61
Senate4/7/20164/1/2016Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments61
Senate Requests House Recede61
Conference Committee Appointed61
Senators Pinsky, Waugh, and Conway61
House4/8/20164/2/2016House Refuses to Recede65
Conference Committee Appointed65
Delegates Kaiser, Hornberger, and A. Washington65
Senate4/11/20164/7/2016Conference Committee Report Adopted67
Third Reading Passed (46-0)67
House4/11/20164/9/2016Conference Committee Report Adopted72
Third Reading Passed (141-0)72
Senate4/11/20164/7/2016Passed Enrolled72
Post Passage5/10/20165/10/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:10 P.M.