SB0802

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Retirement Community License

Sponsored by:

Senator Oaks

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


Synopsis:Establishing a continuing care retirement community license in Baltimore City; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue the license for use by a continuing care retirement community that is located in the 41st alcoholic beverages district of the City and that has obtained a certain certificate of registration; specifying that the license authorizes the holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor to a community resident or the guest of a resident for on-premises consumption; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Oaks, McFadden, and Robinson
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0245
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingEconomic Matters
Broad Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Narrow Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Continuing Care -see also- Long-Term Care; Nursing Homes
Registration -see also- Motor Vehicle Registration
Retail Sales
Statutes:Article - Alcoholic Beverages
(12-1001.1, 12-102)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 13, 2018 11:00 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20182/5/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
3/8/20183/8/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Favorable Report Adopted42
Second Reading Passed42
3/12/20183/12/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)44
House3/13/20183/10/2018First Reading Economic Matters44
3/28/20183/28/2018Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/28/20183/21/2018Favorable Report Adopted55
Second Reading Passed55
3/29/20183/22/2018Third Reading Passed (135-0)56
Senate3/30/20183/27/2018Returned Passed58
Post Passage5/25/20185/25/2018Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 29, 2018 3:55 P.M.