SB0848 (CH0614)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Income Tax Credit - Wineries and Vineyards - Procedures to Claim Credit and Sunset Extension

Sponsored by:

Senator Serafini

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 614


Synopsis:Altering the method by which an individual or a corporation may claim a credit against the State income tax for certain expenses related to certain wineries and vineyards in the State; extending for 3 years a certain termination provision for the credit; applying the Act to all credits certified after December 31, 2017; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Serafini
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Income
Narrow Subject(s):Agriculture -see also- Farmland
Alcoholic Beverages -see also- AB-By Subd; Subst Abuse; etc.
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Income Tax
Sunset
Tax Credits
Statutes:Article - Chapter of the Acts
(2013)
Article - Tax - General
(10-735)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 18, 2018 4:02 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20182/5/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/7/20182/7/2018Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20183/14/2018Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/15/20183/15/2018Favorable Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed47
3/19/20183/17/2018Third Reading Passed (47-0)48C
House3/20/20183/16/2018First Reading Ways and Means50
3/22/20183/22/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/9/20184/9/2018Favorable Report by Ways and Means
4/9/20184/3/2018Favorable Report Adopted68
Second Reading Passed68
4/9/20184/4/2018Third Reading Passed (138-0)69
Senate12/8/20174/5/2018Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/15/20185/15/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 614

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:17 P.M.