SB0855

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Carroll County - Public Schools - Collection of Biometric Information from Students - Prohibited

Sponsored by:

Senator Getty

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means


Synopsis:Prohibiting the Carroll County Board of Education or a person subject to the direction and control of the county board from collecting biometric information from students enrolled in a public school; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senator Getty
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  Listen to Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Carroll County
Education, Boards of
Fingerprinting
Identification
Public Employees -see also- State Employees
Public Schools
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-435)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 2, 2015 9:13 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/7/20132/7/2013First Reading Senate Rules
2/13/20132/13/2013Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/20132/20/2013Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {294932/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/21/20133/19/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)50
House3/21/20133/18/2013First Reading Ways and Means51
3/21/20133/21/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20134/6/2013Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 18, 2013 4:07 P.M.