SB0865 (CH0567)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Transparency Requirements and Member Rights

Sponsored by:

Senator Benson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567


Synopsis:Requiring specified meetings of a cooperative housing corporation to be open to the members of the cooperative housing corporation or their agents; requiring the governing body of a cooperative housing corporation to keep books and records in a specified manner; establishing a specified dispute settlement mechanism for specified complaints or demands arising between specified cooperative housing corporations and their members; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senator Benson
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1328
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings   View Committee HearingEnvironmental Matters   View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Real Property
Corporations and Associations
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Office of the Courts
Appeals -see also- Judicial Review
Assessments
Attorneys' Fees
Auditors and Audits
Baltimore City
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Clerks of Court
Corporations -see also- Municipal Corps; Public Corps & Inst
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Eviction
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Hearings
Housing -see also- Apartments; Condos; Mobile & Manuf Homes
Leases and Rent
Notices
Public Information
Recordings -see also- Video
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Rules and Regulations
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:57 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/31/20141/31/2014First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/5/20142/5/2014Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
3/10/20143/10/2014Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/11/20143/8/2014Favorable Report Adopted42
Second Reading Passed42
3/13/20143/10/2014Third Reading Passed (47-0)44
House3/13/20143/10/2014First Reading Environmental Matters46
3/14/20143/14/2014Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19/20143/19/2014Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20144/5/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
4/5/20143/29/2014Favorable with Amendments {650514/2 Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed with Amendments65
4/5/20143/30/2014Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0)66
Senate4/7/20143/28/2014Senate Concur - House Amendments62
Third Reading Passed (47-0)62
Passed Enrolled62
Post Passage5/15/20145/15/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:57 P.M.