SB0871

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Accountability - Consolidated State Plan and Support and Improvement Plans (Protect Our Schools Act of 2017)

Sponsored by:

Senator Zucker

Status:

In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations


Synopsis:Requiring an educational accountability program to include at least three school quality indicators that measure the comparative opportunities provided to students or the level of student success in public schools; prohibiting the school quality indicators from being based on student testing; requiring the State Board to establish a composite score that provides for a meaningful differentiation of schools under the school accountability system: authorizing a specified plan to include a lengthening of the school year; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Zucker
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0978
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingRules and Executive Nominations
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Assessments
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Federal Government
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Students
Teachers
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-203, 7-203.4)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:13 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/3/20172/3/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/20172/8/2017Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20173/23/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/20173/21/2017Favorable with Amendments {654138/150
Motion Special Order until 3/24 (Senator Ready) Rejected (15-31)50
Laid Over (Senator Pinsky) Adopted50
3/24/20173/22/2017Favorable with Amendments {654138/151
Special Order until 3/27 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 51
3/27/20173/23/2017Favorable with Amendments {654138/152
Special Order until later today (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 52
3/28/20173/24/2017Favorable with Amendments {654138/1 Report Adopted53
Floor Amendment {223327/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted53
Floor Amendment {753829/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted53
Floor Amendment {663924/1 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted53
Floor Amendment {893426/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted53
Second Reading Passed with Amendments53
3/29/20173/25/2017Third Reading Passed (31-15)54
House3/30/20173/26/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations60

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:13 P.M.