SB0875

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act

Sponsored by:

Senator Zucker

Status:

In the Senate - Passed Enrolled


Synopsis:Altering the definition of "campaign material" to include certain material that is disseminated and certain qualifying paid digital communications; altering the definition of "public communication" to include certain qualifying paid digital communications for purposes of certain provisions of law that require a person who makes independent expenditures of a certain amount to file a certain report; requiring an online platform to make available certain records for public inspection for a certain time period under certain circumstances; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senator Zucker
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0981
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Elections
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Advertising
Attorney General
Campaign Financing
Circuit Courts
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Communications -see also- Electronic Comm; Language; Telecom
Data -see also- Census; Demographics
Disclosure
Elections -see also- Ballots; Camp Financ; Pol Cands; Voting
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Communication -see also- Comm; Elec.Gov; Lang; Te
Electronic Government -see also- Electronic Communication
Evidence
Identification
Inspections -see also- Motor Vehicle Inspection
International Affairs -see also- Foreign Trade
News Media
Notices
Political Candidates
Political Committees
Postal Service
Prices -see also- Consumer Price Index
Public Information
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Subpoenas
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Video
Statutes:Article - Election Law
(1-101, 13-306, 13-307, 13-401, 13-403, 13-405, 13-405.1, 13-405.2)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 18, 2018 3:26 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20182/5/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/20182/7/2018Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20183/29/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/20183/26/2018Favorable with Amendments {724431/157
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted57
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted57
3/30/20183/27/2018Favorable with Amendments {724431/1 Report Adopted58
Floor Amendment {553421/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted58
Second Reading Passed with Amendments58
4/2/20183/28/2018Third Reading Passed (44-1)59
House4/3/20183/25/2018First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations59
4/4/20184/5/2018Rereferred to Ways and Means
4/5/20184/5/2018Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20184/7/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/7/20183/30/2018Favorable with Amendments {115762/1 Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/9/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (95-40)66
Senate4/9/20184/3/2018Senate Concur - House Amendments65
Third Reading Passed (41-0)65
Passed Enrolled

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 9, 2018 4:54 P.M.