SB0905 (CH0701)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education

Sponsored by:

Senator King

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 701


Synopsis:Establishing the Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education; requiring specified appointments to be made to ensure diversity within the Commission; requiring the Commission to review the findings and recommendations of a specified study, review specified education finance formulas, and review specified accountability measures; requiring a specified master plan to include specified information for calendar years 2016 and 2017; requiring the State Department of Education to convene a specified stakeholders group; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators King, Miller, Astle, Conway, DeGrange, Ferguson, Gladden, Guzzone, Kagan, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Rosapepe, Zirkin, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0999
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Apprentices
Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Language
Legislative Services, Department of
Reports
Special Education
Students
Sunset
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:10 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20162/5/2016First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m.
2/17/20162/17/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/03 at 8:30 a.m.
2/19/20162/19/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/01 at 8:30 a.m.
3/7/20163/7/2016Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/8/20163/8/2016Favorable Report Adopted39
Second Reading Passed39
3/10/20163/10/2016Third Reading Passed (46-0)41
House3/11/20163/11/2016First Reading Ways and Means43
3/22/20163/22/2016Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20163/23/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
3/24/20163/24/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20164/4/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/4/20163/28/2016Favorable with Amendments {535362/1 Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/5/20163/29/2016Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)61
Senate4/6/20163/31/2016Senate Concur - House Amendments60
Third Reading Passed (46-0)60
Passed Enrolled60
Post Passage5/28/20165/28/2016Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 701

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:10 P.M.