SB0911

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Veteran Suicide Prevention - Comprehensive Action Plan

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Requiring the Department of Veterans Affairs to develop a certain action plan to increase access to and the availability of professional veteran health services to prevent veteran suicides; requiring the plan to address certain matters; requiring the Department to collaborate with interested parties in developing the plan; requiring the Department to implement certain initiatives and reforms by June 30, 2022, and June 30, 2028; terminating the Act after June 30, 2028; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Waugh, Astle, Bates, Benson, Brochin, Cassilly, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Edwards, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Ready, Reilly, Robinson, Rosapepe, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, Smith, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingHealth and Government Operations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Death -see also- Advance Medical Directives; Wrongful Death
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Health -see also- Mental and Behavioral Health
Health, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Reports
Sunset
Veterans Affairs, Department of
Veterans
Statutes:Article - State Government
(9-947)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 27, 2018 4:06 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20182/5/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/20182/7/2018Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
3/8/20183/8/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Favorable Report Adopted42
Second Reading Passed42
3/12/20183/12/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)44
House3/13/20183/10/2018First Reading Health and Government Operations44
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 21, 2018 1:21 P.M.