SB0950

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Students With Disabilities - Study of Parental Consent in the Individualized Education Program Process

Sponsored by:

Senator Conway

Status:

In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (45-0)


Synopsis:Requiring the State Department of Education to convene a workgroup in consultation with specified stakeholders to review specified special education statutes and regulations, make specified determinations regarding "parental consent", discuss specified issues, and make specified recommendation on or before November 15, 2016 to specified committees of the General Assembly.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senator Conway
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Assessments
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Discipline
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Foster Care
Hearings
Judges
Mediation -see also- Arbitration
Notices
Private Schools
Public Schools
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Special Education
Students
Teachers
Witnesses
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:11 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20162/5/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20163/18/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Favorable with Amendments {224338/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/21/20163/19/2016Third Reading Passed (45-0)48
House3/21/20163/19/2016First Reading Ways and Means51
3/22/20163/22/2016Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20163/23/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
3/24/20163/24/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
4/8/20164/8/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/8/20164/2/2016Favorable with Amendments {235163/1 Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed with Amendments65
4/9/20164/4/2016Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0)67
Senate4/11/20164/5/2016Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments65
Senate Requests House Recede65
Conference Committee Appointed65
Senators Kagan, Bates, and Conway65
House4/11/20164/7/2016House Refuses to Recede70
Conference Committee Appointed70
Delegates M. Washington, Hornberger, and Ebersole70
Senate4/11/20164/7/2016Conference Committee Report Adopted67
Third Reading Passed (45-0)67

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:11 P.M.